EP0904366 - APO-2LI AND APO-3 APOPTOSIS POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHKENAZI, Avi, J. 1456 Tarrytown Street San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1999/13] | O'Brien, Caroline Jane MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97917736.7 | 31.03.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997US05230 | Priority number, date | US19960625328 | 01.04.1996 Original published format: US 625328 | US19960710802 | 23.09.1996 Original published format: US 710802 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737020 | Date: | 09.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904366 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/715, C07K14/47, C12N5/10, C07K16/18, C07K16/46, A61K38/17, A01K67/027 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/70578 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C07K2319/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | APO-2LI UND APO-3 APOPTOSIS POLYPEPTIDE | [2007/17] | English: | APO-2LI AND APO-3 APOPTOSIS POLYPEPTIDES | [1999/13] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE L'APOPTOSE APO-2LI ET APO-3 | [2007/17] |
Former [1999/13] | APO-2LI AND APO-3 APOPTOSIS POLYPEPTIDEN | ||
Former [1999/13] | POLYPEPTIDES DE L'APOPTOSE APO-2L1 ET APO-3 | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 23.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/23] | Appeal following examination | 18.10.2004 | Appeal received No. T0070/05 | 23.12.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.02.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 07.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP04014636.7 / EP1500702 | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2007 | Decision despatched | 21.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0510691 (OSAKA BIOSCIENCE INST [JP]) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [PX] - KITSON J ET AL, "A death-domain-containing receptor that mediates apoptosis.", NATURE, NOV 28 1996, 384 (6607) P372-5, ENGLAND, XP002036560 [PX] 19-27,32-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/384372a0 | [PX] - CHINNAIYAN AM ET AL, "Signal transduction by DR3, a death domain-containing receptor related to TNFR-1 and CD95.", SCIENCE, NOV 8 1996, 274 (5289) P990-2, UNITED STATES, XP000676685 [PX] 19-27,32-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.274.5289.990 |