EP0925009 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR OPENING OYSTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guilloux, Gabriel Loscolo 56760 Penestin / FR | [2002/16] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Guilloux, Gabriel Pointe de Loscolo 56760 Penestin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97918231.8 | 15.04.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997FR00674 | Priority number, date | FR19960005049 | 17.04.1996 Original published format: FR 9605049 | [1999/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738613 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925009 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925009 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47G21/06, A22C29/04 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
A22C29/046 (EP);
A47G21/00 (KR);
A47G21/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM ÖFFNEN VON AUSTERN | [1999/26] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR OPENING OYSTERS | [1999/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'OUVERTURE DES HUITRES | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2001 | 30.04.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.2003 | FI | 22.01.2003 | GB | 22.01.2003 | GR | 22.01.2003 | IE | 22.01.2003 | IT | 22.01.2003 | NL | 22.01.2003 | DK | 22.04.2003 | PT | 22.04.2003 | SE | 22.04.2003 | DE | 23.04.2003 | BE | 30.04.2003 | CH | 30.04.2003 | LI | 30.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GB | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
DE | 23.04.2003 | ||
BE | 30.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GB | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
DE | 23.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
DE | 23.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
DK | 22.04.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
IE | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 22.01.2003 | |
FI | 22.01.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
GR | 22.01.2003 | ||
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
PT | 22.04.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 22.01.2003 | |
NL | 22.01.2003 | ||
SE | 22.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 22.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]JPH02251392 ; | [A]US2854688 (COLANGELO VIRGINIA A) [A] 1,4 * column W *; | [A]FR1194003 (REB); | [XY]FR2542597 (NICOLAS RENE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5; | [A]US5145448 (EBISUZAKI SUSUMU [JP]) | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901225), vol. 014, no. 579, Database accession no. (M - 1063), & JP02251392 A 19901009 (SANYOO KK) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * [A] 1-3,6 |