EP0897341 - RADIATOR AND CONDENSER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse, Postfach 60 04 02 50735 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:ES
FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse, Postfach 60 04 02 50735 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:ES
Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPALDI, Benedict 89 Bradford Street Chelmsford, Essex CM2 0BG / GB | 02 /
CLIFTON, Andrew 12 St. Ivian Court, Colney Hatch Lane London N10 1EI / GB | 03 /
WHITE, Ian, David 10 Queen Street, Warley Brentwood, Essex CM14 5JZ / GB | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97918278.9 | 01.05.1997 | [1999/08] | WO1997GB01191 | Priority number, date | GB19960009440 | 04.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609440 | GB19960009437 | 04.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609437 | [1999/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9742049 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897341 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897341 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/04, B60H1/32, F28F9/00 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
F28F9/002 (EP,US);
B60H1/3227 (EP);
B60H1/3229 (US);
B60K11/04 (EP);
F28D1/0435 (EP);
F28D2021/0084 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/08] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON RADIATOR UND KONDENSATOR | [1999/08] | English: | RADIATOR AND CONDENSER ASSEMBLY | [1999/08] | French: | ENSEMBLE RADIATEUR ET CONDENSATEUR | [1999/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.05.2000 | [2004/37] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0566473 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 17 - line 36; figures 5,6 * |