EP0896563 - APPARATUS FOR LAUNCHING AND LANDING OF BOATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grönstrand, Jan Krakbärsgatan 7 234 43 Lomma / SE | [1999/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar, et al L.A. Groth & Co. KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar, et al L.A. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/07] | Magnusson, Gustav, et al MAGNUPATENT AB P.O. Box 6207 200 11 Malmö 6 / SE | Application number, filing date | 97918472.8 | 18.04.1997 | [1999/07] | WO1997SE00657 | Priority number, date | SE19960001535 | 22.04.1996 Original published format: SE 9601535 | [1999/07] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739940 | Date: | 30.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896563 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B63B23/00 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
B63B23/38 (EP,US);
B63B23/00 (KR);
B63B23/30 (EP,US);
B63B27/36 (EP,US);
B63B2027/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] |
Former [1999/07] | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 09.11.1998 | LV | 09.11.1998 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSSETZEN UND ZUM ANBORDNEHMEN VON BOOTEN | [1999/07] | English: | APPARATUS FOR LAUNCHING AND LANDING OF BOATS | [1999/07] | French: | APPAREIL POUR METTRE A L'EAU ET RECUPERER DES CANOTS | [1999/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1997 | Translation filed | 09.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/31] | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/31] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP52126890 ; | [A]NO141929B (AUKRA BRUK AS, et al); | [A]GB2150903 (BERGER PER); | [A]NO162184B (SHIPS A S EXCELSIOR [NO]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 2, No. 12, M-4; & JP,A,52 126 890 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K.), 25 October 1977., & JP52126890 A 19771025 |