EP0902975 - MICROELECTRONICS PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratedge Corporation Suite D, 4393 Viewridge Avenue San Diego, CA 92123 / US | [1999/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIN, Deborah, S. 15809 South 28th Place Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Paul, M. 4346 Charger Boulevard San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 03 /
LINDNER, Alan, W. 5226 Cobb Place San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 04 /
GOETZ, Martin 1927 Colleen Drive Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 05 /
BABIARZ, Joseph 9949 Maya Linda 38 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Croston, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Croston, David, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [1999/12] | Wilson, Nicholas Martin, et al WITHERS & ROGERS, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97918585.7 | 11.04.1997 | [1999/12] | WO1997US06091 | Priority number, date | US19960645729 | 14.05.1996 Original published format: US 645729 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743787 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902975 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/66 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/67121 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15788 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1579 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1616 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1617 (EP,US);
H01L2924/167 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16787 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16788 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/12] | Title | German: | MIKROELEKTRONISCHE PACKUNG | [1999/12] | English: | MICROELECTRONICS PACKAGE | [1999/12] | French: | BOITIER MICRO-ELECTRONIQUE | [1999/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 18.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/27] | 01.05.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/27] | Appeal following examination | 09.05.2002 | Appeal received No. T1099/02 | 17.07.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.04.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3958195 (JOHNSON JOSEPH H); | [YA]EP0275973 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [Y] 1,28 * claim 1 * [A] 3,9,11,15,19,29; | [A]US5117068 (SEIEROE LOUIS M [US], et al); | [A]EP0527468 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [DYA]US5448826 (GOETZ MARTIN [US], et al) [DY] 1,28 * figures 1,2A,2B; claims 1,5-7,9,10 * [A] 2,3,6,8,9,11,14,15,20 |