EP0896685 - ORGANIC PHOTOCHROMIC CONTACT LENS COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRITY, Norman, E. 9 W. Knollbrook Lane Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97918785.3 | 21.04.1997 | [1999/07] | WO1997US06776 | Priority number, date | US19960016517P | 30.04.1996 Original published format: US 16517 P | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741468 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896685 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/23, G02B1/04 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G02B5/23 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/07] | G02B5/23 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/07] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE PHOTOCHROME MISCHUNGEN FÜR KONTAKTLINSEN | [1999/07] | English: | ORGANIC PHOTOCHROMIC CONTACT LENS COMPOSITIONS | [1999/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LENTILLES DE CONTACT PHOTOCHROMIQUES ORGANIQUES | [1999/07] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/07] | 01.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/19] | 05.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO9618926 (CORNING INC ;FLORENT FREDERIC HENRI (FR); HENRY DAVID (FR); VACHET) [PA] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [PA]WO9619741 (CORNING INC ;CHAN YOU PING (FR); HENRY DAVID (FR); MEYRUEIX REMY () [PA] 1 * claims 1-8 * * page 7, line 4 - line 10 *; | [A]EP0605293 (ESSILOR INT) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4306780 (TARUMI NIRO ET AL) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS58113203 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830920), vol. 007, no. 213, Database accession no. (C - 187), & JP58113203 A 19830706 (NIHON KANKOU SHIKISO KENKYUSHO:KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1983-737296 [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]WO9510790 ; | [Y]US5395566 |