EP0904432 - CARPET YARN HAVING HIGH SOIL RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEMAN, Bart P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [1999/13] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 97918831.5 | 18.02.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997US02398 | Priority number, date | EP19960103564 | 07.03.1996 Original published format: EP 96103564 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733019 | Date: | 12.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904432 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904432 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D01F1/09, D01F6/04, D01F6/06 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
D02G3/445 (EP,US);
D01F1/09 (EP,US);
D01F6/04 (EP,US);
D01F6/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2971 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/13] | Title | German: | TEPPICHGARN MIT HOHEN SCHMUTZABWEISENDE EIGENSCHAFTEN | [1999/13] | English: | CARPET YARN HAVING HIGH SOIL RESISTANCE | [1999/13] | French: | FIL POUR TAPIS AYANT UNE HAUTE RESISTANCE A LA SALISSURE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 14.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00204588.8 / EP1111102 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.02.2002 | DK | 28.02.2002 | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/46] | DK | 28.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0122623 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,10,12,13,16,18,24 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9533882 (LYONDELL PETROCHEM [US]) [X] 1,3,4,10,12,13,16,18,24 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9601916 (LYONDELL PETROCHEM [US]) [X] 1,3,4,10,12,13,16,18,24 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0516271 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-24 * column W *; | [AD]WO9218569 (PEACH STATE LABS INC [US]) [AD] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9501396 (PEACH STATE LABS INC [US]) [AD] 1-24 * the whole document * |