EP0925682 - PROCESS FOR DETECTING EDGES IN AN IMAGE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/10] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMER, Aishy Ostenbergstrasse 107 D-44227 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
REICHERT, Steffen Am Kockshof 53 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | [1999/26] | Application number, filing date | 97918905.7 | 25.08.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997DE01850 | Priority number, date | DE1996136949 | 11.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19636949 | [1999/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9811717 | Date: | 19.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925682 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925682 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/14 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
H04N1/4092 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1999/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON KANTEN IN EINEM BILDSIGNAL | [1999/26] | English: | PROCESS FOR DETECTING EDGES IN AN IMAGE SIGNAL | [1999/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'ARETES DANS UN SIGNAL VIDEO | [1999/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9515537 (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 5, line 15 - page 16, line 6 *; | [A]US5452367 (BICK ULRICH [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 34 *; | [A]US5537485 (NISHIKAWA ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 42 - column 7, line 54 *; | [A]US4477926 (LINGER CLAUDE J A [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 30 - column 7, line 28 *; | [A]US4481664 (LINGER CLAUDE J A [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 7, line 9 - line 58 *; | [A]US5438636 (SURKA STEFAN [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 8, line 14 - column 11, line 39 * |