EP0938301 - DIRECTLY COMPRESSIBLE LACTITOL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danisco Sweeteners Oy Keilaranta 9 02151 Espoo / FI | [2002/28] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Xyrofin Oy P.O. Box 213 SF-48101 Kotka / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARSON, Julita 219 Pickhurst Rise West Wickham, Kent BR4 0QA / GB | 02 /
OLINGER, Philip 422 Trailwood Drive Terre Haute, IN 47802 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene Borenius & Co Oy Ab, Kansakoulukuja 3 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97919075.8 | 16.09.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997FI00548 | Priority number, date | US19960715825 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: US 715825 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9811878 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938301 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938301 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0938301 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K47/26, A61K9/16 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A61K47/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Extension states | LT | 15.03.1999 | SI | 15.03.1999 | Title | German: | DIREKT VERPRESSBARES LACTITOL UND VERFAHREN DAZU | [2002/18] | English: | DIRECTLY COMPRESSIBLE LACTITOL AND METHOD | [1999/35] | French: | LACTITOL DIRECTEMENT COMPRESSIBLE ET PROCEDE | [1999/35] |
Former [1999/35] | Direkt verpressbares LActitol und Verfahren dazu | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
15.02.2005
WITHDRAWN PURAC Biochem B.V. Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL Opponent's representative Verbart, Jeannette J.M. Purac Biochem B.V. Arkelsdijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
15.02.2005
WITHDRAWN PURAC Biochem B.V. Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL Opponent's representative Verbart, Jeannette J.M. Purac Biochem B.V. Arkelsdijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | ||
Former [2003/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
29.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE PURAC Biochem B.V. Arkelsedijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL Opponent's representative Verbart, Jeannette J.M. Purac Biochem B.V. Arkelsdijk 46 4206 AC Gorinchem / NL | 24.10.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.06.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.12.2005 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.2002 | BE | 18.12.2002 | FI | 18.12.2002 | GR | 18.12.2002 | NL | 18.12.2002 | DK | 18.03.2003 | PT | 18.03.2003 | SE | 18.03.2003 | IE | 16.09.2003 | LU | 16.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
FI | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
IE | 16.09.2003 | ||
LU | 16.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
FI | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
LU | 16.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
FI | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
BE | 18.12.2002 | ||
FI | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
FI | 18.12.2002 | ||
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 18.12.2002 | |
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 18.12.2002 | |
NL | 18.12.2002 | ||
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 18.12.2002 | |
SE | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 18.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XP]JP09216816 ; | [X]US5204115 (OLINGER PHILIP M [US], et al); | [A]US5536526 (VIRTANEN JOUKO [FI], et al) | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, File 351, Dialog Accession No. 011488285, NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD: "Highly Water-Soluble Solid Medical Fast-Dissolving Tablet - Produced by Kneading Lactitol with Water and Compressing"; & JP,A,09 216 816, (19-08-97), (BASIC)., & JP09216816 A 00000000 | Opposition | WO9706808 |