EP0840816 - WEAVING FRAME AND METHOD FOR BOBBIN CHANGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Michel Van de Wiele Michel Van de Wielestraat 7/17 B-8510 Kortrijk (Marke) / BE | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMEULEN, Erik Karmelietenlaan 3 B-8500 Kortrijk / BE | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Leherte, Georges M.L.M. K.O.B. N.V. Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., Dr. K.O.B. n.v., Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 97919207.7 | 16.04.1997 | [1998/20] | WO1997BE00045 | Priority number, date | BE19960000336 | 17.04.1996 Original published format: BE 9600336 | [1998/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739171 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0840816 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840816 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D02H1/00, B65H49/16 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
D02H1/00 (EP,US);
B65H49/16 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [1998/20] | Title | German: | WEBSPULENGATTER UND SPULENWECHSELVERFAHREN | [2001/51] | English: | WEAVING FRAME AND METHOD FOR BOBBIN CHANGING | [1998/20] | French: | BATI DE METIER A TISSER ET PROCEDE POUR LE CHANGEMENT DE BOBINES | [1998/20] |
Former [1998/20] | WEBSPULLENGATTER UND SPULENWECHSELVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1997 | Translation filed | 25.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 31.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE4442231 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [A] 6,8,11,13; | [A]US3432118 (CARRUTHERS GEORGE A) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2318815 (RHONE POULENC TEXTILE [FR]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * figure - *; | [A]BE545165 (TYLEX) [A] 6-8 * figure - *; | [A]US3172616 (HANSEN RONALD R) [A] 1,6,7 * figure - *; | [A]EP0329614 (BENNINGER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 15-19 * column 5, line 25 - line 40 *; | [A]EP0467101 (HACOBA TEXTILMASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 15-19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3538838 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 15-19 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2629840 (BORDMANN JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 6 * figure - * |