Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0886468
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
11.11.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
26.11.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] |
18.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.04.1999 |
First examination report |
|
26.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.11.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] |
13.11.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] |
12.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|