EP0925396 - KNITTED WOUND DRESSINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/26] | KNITTED WOUND DRESSINGS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | ||
[2002/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York New York 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COURT, Andrew, D. 72 Greenfields Drive Little Neston, South Wirral L64 0LU / GB | 02 /
MAHONEY, Peter, M.J. Lletty Meirch Farm, Llanfihangel-Ng-Nhwynfa Nr. Llanfyllin, Powys SY22 5JF / GB | 03 /
LYDON, Michael, James Tennant Farm, The Vownog Sychdyn, Mold, Flintshire CH7 6EW / GB | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettel, Patent Attorneys, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2001/22] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1999/26] | Mays, Julie Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Patent Department, Swakeleys House, Milton Road Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8NS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97919360.4 | 11.04.1997 | [1999/26] | WO1997EP01881 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846818 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925396 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925396 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/16 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
A61F13/01042 (EP,US);
A61F13/01008 (EP,US);
A61L15/28 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US);
D04B21/16 (EP,US);
A61F13/069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/26] | Title | German: | GESTRICKTER WUNDVERBUND | [2002/42] | English: | KNITTED WOUND DRESSINGS | [2002/42] | French: | PANSEMENTS TRICOTES | [2002/42] |
Former [1999/26] | GESTRICKTER WUNDVERBUND UND VERFAHREN ZUR SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1999/26] | KNITTED WOUND DRESSINGS AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | ||
Former [1999/26] | PANSEMENTS TRICOTES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CES DERNIERS | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | SE | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/05] | FI | 02.05.2003 | |
SE | 02.08.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | SE | 02.08.2003 | |
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 02.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3645836 (TORR DAVID) [A] 1,2,6-8,11,13 * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 43 *; | [A]EP0475807 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,8,10-14 * page 2, line 50 - page 6, line 28 *; | [DA]WO9519795 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,7-14* see the whole document * |