EP0838121 - CALL SET-UP FOR FIXED WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA ISRAEL LIMITED 16 Kremenetski Street Tel Aviv 67899 / IL | [1998/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZILBERFARB, Yossi 3 Yalkut Haroeem Street 67449 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
ALTMAN, Shamay 3a Hamal Street 45200 Hod Hasharon / IL | 03 /
SVEC, Larry, D. 520 Greenview Drive Wauconda, IL 60084 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | Jepsen, René Pihl, et al European Patent Attorney Eltima Consulting, Shaftesbury Centre Percy Street Rodbourne Swindon SN2 2AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Jepsen, Rene Pihl, et al Eltima Consulting Shaftesbury Centre Percy Street Swindon SN2 2AZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus, Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [1998/18] | Potts, Susan Patricia, et al Motorola Limited European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97919579.9 | 07.05.1997 | [1998/18] | WO1997IB00514 | Priority number, date | GB19960009692 | 09.05.1996 Original published format: GB 9609692 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9742777 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838121 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0838121 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20 | [1998/18] | CPC: |
H04W84/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE [1998/18] | Title | German: | RUFEINLEITUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSES FESTES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [1998/18] | English: | CALL SET-UP FOR FIXED WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [1998/18] | French: | ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE COMMUNICATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [1998/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 29.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.01.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | ES | 25.04.2004 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9515664 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 26, line 27 - page 28, line 24 *; | [PX]WO9639001 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [PX] 1-7 * page 9, line 32 - page 11, line 22 *; | [E]WO9720445 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [E] 1-7* page 7, line 7 - page 16, line 8 * |