EP0852061 - ELECTRIC LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERSPAGET, Godefridus, Nicolaas, Maria Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN DULMEN, Hendrikus, Albertus, Maria Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/28] | Evers, Johannes Hubertus Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 97919603.7 | 13.05.1997 | [1998/28] | WO1997IB00540 | Priority number, date | EP19960201639 | 12.06.1996 Original published format: EP 96201639 | [1998/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9748116 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852061 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852061 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/46, H01J61/36, // H01J5/48, H01J5/50 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
H01J5/46 (EP,US);
H01J61/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/28] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE | [1998/28] | English: | ELECTRIC LAMP | [1998/28] | French: | AMPOULE ELECTRIQUE | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4015165 (HARDIES ALFONS EUGEEN MARIA); | [X]US4139794 (MALM ROBERT N, et al); | [Y]US4823049 (SANDERS RUDOLF [NL], et al); | [A]WO9210850 (GTE PROD CORP [US]); | [A]US4254355 (TAYLOR WILLIAM L) |