Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0895915
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
18.06.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
09.04.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
09.04.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
28.06.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] |
20.06.2003 |
Change - English title |
published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
18.06.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.01.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.06.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] |
16.06.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] |
25.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.12.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.02.1999 [1999/06] |
23.12.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.02.1999 [1999/06] |
04.11.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|