EP0844626 - TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Markov, Gennady Alexandrovich ul. Geroev Truda, 23-34 Novosibirsk, 630055 / RU | [2010/21] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states MARKOV, Gennady Alexandrovich ul. Geroev Truda, 23-24 Novosibirsk, 630055 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Henseler, Daniela, et al Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Henseler, Daniela, et al Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1998/22] | Röhl, Wolf Horst, Dipl.-Phys., Dr. Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97919797.7 | 10.04.1997 | [1998/22] | WO1997RU00110 | Priority number, date | RU19960106791 | 16.04.1996 Original published format: RU 96106791 | RU19970101702 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: RU 97101702 | [1998/22] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9739463 | Date: | 23.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844626 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844626 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 23.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01F30/06, H01F27/28 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
H01F30/10 (EP);
H01F30/06 (EP,KR);
H01F27/28 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, LI, NL, SE [1998/22] | Title | German: | TRANSFORMATOR | [1998/22] | English: | TRANSFORMER | [1998/22] | French: | TRANSFORMATEUR | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1997 | Translation filed | 12.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1997 | Search fee paid | 12.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | NL | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | [2011/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2519224 (CHILES JR JOHN H, et al) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 2 *; | [X]US3657678 (SCHWENDEN CARL A) [X] 1,6-10 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2586352 (REUBEN LEE); | [A]US1659548 (JOHANNESEN SVEND E) | International search | [A]US4403205 (LEIBINGER GEORGE E [US], et al); | [A]GB1200246 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0257291 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]SU260004 ; | [A]SU130568 (MANKIN E M A); | [A]SU607287 (KLIMOV MIKHAIL A [SU]) |