blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980231

EP0980231 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED FLUID DISTRIBUTION MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LAVON, Gary, Dean
7320 Canterbury Court
Middletown, OH 45044 / US
02 / YOUNG, Gerald, Alfred
1101 Hearthstone Drive
Cincinnati, OH 45231 / US
03 / PALUMBO, Gianfranco
Georgenfeld 7
D-61348 Bad Homburg / DE
04 / SCHMIDT, Mattias
Altkoenigweg 3
D-65510 Idstein / DE
05 / EHRNSPERGER, Bruno, Johannes
Am Hopfengarten 19
D-60489 Frankfurt / DE
06 / NEUMANN, Frank
Frankfurter Strasse 120
D-65779 Kelkheim / DE
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date97919980.927.03.1997
[2000/08]
WO1997US05234
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843580
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980231
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980231
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/15
[2000/08]
CPC:
A61F13/5376 (EP,US); A61F13/15 (KR); A61F13/15203 (EP,US);
A61F13/532 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTEN MATERIALIEN ZUR FLÜSSIGKEITSVERTEILUNG[2000/08]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED FLUID DISTRIBUTION MATERIALS[2000/08]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT DOTE DE MATIERES PERMETTANT UNE REPARTITION AMELIOREE DES FLUIDES[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
28.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2002Fee for grant paid
04.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
IE27.03.2003
LU27.03.2003
[2004/39]
Former [2004/15]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
IE27.03.2003
Former [2004/02]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/39]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/37]AT11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
Former [2003/29]PT11.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0339461  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 24 * page 12, line 5 - line 6; figure 20 ** page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 19 *;
 [A]US4994037  (BERNARDIN LEO J [US]) [A] 1-13,15-17,21 * column 13, line 10 - column 14, line 32; figures 10,11; claims 1-3,48; table - *;
 [A]EP0455607  (FARICERCA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7-17,21 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 11 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 7; figures 3-5; claims 1,2,8,9 *;
 [AD]US5147345  (YOUNG GERALD A [US], et al) [AD] 20 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9510995  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 4-6 * page 29, line 21 - page 30, line 2 * * page 68, line 6 - page 69, line 37 *;
 [A]EP0692232  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 22,23 * claims 1-11,19; table 1 *;
 [A]EP0700672  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-13,15-17,19,26 * column 21, line 17 - line 41; figures 12,13 * * column 25, line 56 - column 26, line 39 * * column 33, line 8 - line 11 *;
 [A]WO9623473  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 26 * page 6, line 10 - line 25 * * page 11, line 17 - line 20; claim 5 *;
 [A]EP0761192  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * claims 10-17,24-28 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.