EP0889818 - CONVERTIBLE BARROW FOR GROUND LEVEL LOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hall, John R. 38 Willow Lane New Hartford, CT 06057 / US | [1999/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97920287.6 | 08.04.1997 | [1999/02] | WO1997US05915 | Priority number, date | US19960630342 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: US 630342 | [1999/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9737882 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889818 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889818 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62B1/04, B62B1/14 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
B62B5/0089 (EP,US);
B62B1/12 (EP,US);
B62B1/147 (EP,US);
B62B1/20 (EP,US);
B62B2203/07 (EP,US);
B62B2203/70 (EP,US);
B62B2301/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/02] | B62B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/02] | Title | German: | UMWANDELBARER SCHUBWAGEN ZUM LADEN AM BODENNIVEAU | [1999/02] | English: | CONVERTIBLE BARROW FOR GROUND LEVEL LOADING | [1999/02] | French: | BROUETTE CONVERTIBLE A CHARGEMENT AU NIVEAU DU SOL | [1999/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 12.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2004 | BE | 28.04.2004 | CH | 28.04.2004 | FI | 28.04.2004 | LI | 28.04.2004 | NL | 28.04.2004 | DK | 28.07.2004 | GR | 28.07.2004 | SE | 28.07.2004 | PT | 28.09.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2930152 (PIPKIN ROYACE H) [X] 1,9 * figure - *; | [A]US3594932 (ERIKSSON HENNING EMANUEL)[A] 1; | [A]US4735424 (STELTER III RICHARD G [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5123187 (ZAMARIA CHARLES [CA]) [A] 1-14 | International search | [A]US2096994 (MILLEN STANLEY S); | [A]US2374982 (HAMILTON DAVIES PERCY); | [A]FR973445 ; | [A]US3021625 (ROLAND STASSE); | [A]US4062591 (HARRIS DAVID, et al); | [A]US4070060 (HOWARD WILLIAM E); | [A]US4756540 (CRAWFORD HENRY B [GB]); | [A]US4762333 (MORTENSON CARL N [US]); | [A]US4846493 (MASON DONALD W [US]) | by applicant | US87939 | US863275 | US2096994 | US2374982 | US4735424 | US4756540 |