blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1112606

EP1112606 - A DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING ELECTRIC SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västerås / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/27]For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västeras / SE
Inventor(s)01 / STRANDBERG, Lars
Stalverksgatan 140
S-724 77 Västeras / SE
02 / KURTTILA, Erki
Hakantorpsgatan 61
S-724 76 Västeras / SE
 [2001/27]
Representative(s)Olsson, Jan, et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB
P.O.Box 1274
801 37 Gävle / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/27]Olsson, Jan, et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB P.O.Box 1274
801 37 Gävle / SE
Application number, filing date97921029.116.04.1997
[2001/27]
WO1997SE00636
Priority number, dateSE1996000153323.04.1996         Original published format: SE 9601533
[2001/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9740550
Date:30.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1112606
Date:04.07.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1112606
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE30.10.1997
ClassificationIPC:H01R9/26, // H01R25/00
[2005/08]
CPC:
H05K7/1478 (EP,US); H01R31/005 (EP,US); H01R9/2408 (EP,US);
H05K7/1465 (EP,US); H01R9/2491 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2001/27]H01R9/24, // H01R23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2001/27]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNALEN[2001/27]
English:A DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING ELECTRIC SIGNALS[2001/27]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE SIGNAUX ELECTRIQUES[2001/27]
Entry into regional phase22.01.1999National basic fee paid 
22.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
22.01.1999Examination requested  [2001/27]
01.06.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, GR, LU, MC, SE
04.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2004Fee for grant paid
09.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.01.1999AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999CH   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
22.01.1999PT   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.01.1999M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.03.2005
BE02.03.2005
CH02.03.2005
ES02.03.2005
LI02.03.2005
NL02.03.2005
IE18.04.2005
PT03.08.2005
[2007/17]
Former [2006/25]AT02.03.2005
BE02.03.2005
CH02.03.2005
LI02.03.2005
NL02.03.2005
IE18.04.2005
PT03.08.2005
Former [2006/14]AT02.03.2005
BE02.03.2005
CH02.03.2005
LI02.03.2005
NL02.03.2005
PT03.08.2005
Former [2006/12]AT02.03.2005
BE02.03.2005
CH02.03.2005
LI02.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT02.03.2005
BE02.03.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0038607  (DU PONT [US]);
 [A]WO9306636  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.