Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001509785 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US9707046 | 25.04.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2745297 | Global Dossier | 05.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US9707046 | 25.04.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0938325 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2003 | B1 | EP0938325 | 01.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US9707046 | 25.04.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE242636T | 15.06.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US9707046 | 25.04.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2254848 | 24.04.2007 | C | CA2254848 | 04.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US9707046 | 25.04.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69722805T | 06.05.2004 | T2 | DE69722805D1 | 17.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US9707046 | 25.04.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9745129 | Global Dossier | 04.12.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6103254 | 15.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US80226097 | 19.02.1997 | US65598796 | 31.05.1996 |