EP0938325 - METHODS FOR STERILIZING MALE MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRO THERAPEUTICS, INC. 1062-F Calle Negocio San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLACE, George 10 Brentano Road Cota De Caza, CA 92679 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Scott 1252 Country Hills Drive Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 03 /
GREFF, Richard, J. 2891 Alton Drive St. Petersburg Beach, FL 33706 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/35] | Des Termes, Monique, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97921410.3 | 25.04.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US07046 | Priority number, date | US19960655987 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: US 655987 | US19970802260 | 19.02.1997 Original published format: US 802260 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745129 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938325 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938325 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/04, A61K33/24, A61K31/70, A61K31/10, A61K31/765, A61K31/78 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K31/717 (EP,US);
A61K31/765 (EP,US);
A61K31/78 (EP,US);
A61P15/16 (EP);
Y10S424/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/35] | A61K33/04, A61K33/24, A61K31/70, A61K31/10, A61K31/765, A61K31/78, // (A61K33/04, 31:10, 31:765, 31:78),(A61K33/24, 31:10, 31:765, 31:78),(A61K31/70, 31:10, 31:765, 31:78) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/35] | Extension states | AL | 28.12.1998 | LT | 28.12.1998 | LV | 28.12.1998 | RO | 28.12.1998 | SI | 28.12.1998 | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR STERILISATION MÄNNLICHER SÄUGETIERE | [1999/35] | English: | METHODS FOR STERILIZING MALE MAMMALS | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDES DE STERILISATION DE MAMMIFERES MALES | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2003 | BE | 11.06.2003 | CH | 11.06.2003 | FI | 11.06.2003 | LI | 11.06.2003 | NL | 11.06.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | SE | 11.09.2003 | ES | 22.09.2003 | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 11.06.2003 | |
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 11.06.2003 | |
LI | 11.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0050457 (POPULATION RES INC [KY]) [Y] 1-28 * page 1, line 1 - line 32 * * claims 1-13 *; | [XY]WO8500969 (SKY POLYMERS [US]) [X] 1,4-7,11,25-28 * pages 4-7 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 15 * * page 20, line 7 - page 21, line 5 * [Y] 2,3,8-10,12-24; | [PY]WO9704657 (MICRO THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [PY] 1-28* claims 1-46 *; | [DY] - SETHI N. ET AL, "Histological changes in the vas deferens of rats after injection of a new male antifertility agent "SMA" and its reversiblity", CONTRACEPTION, (1990), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 333 - 339, XP002038212 [DY] 1-28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-7824(90)90074-6 | [DY] - ZHAO SHENG-CAI, "Vas deferens occlusion by percutaneous injection of polyurethane elastomer plugs: Clinical experience and reversiblity", CONTRACEPTION, (1990), vol. 41, pages 453 - 459, XP002038213 [DY] 1-28 * abstract * * page 454, column L * * "A. Medical-grade polyurethane elastomer" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-7824(90)90055-Z | [DY] - CHVAPIL M. ET AL, "Occlusion of the vas deferens in dogs with a biocompatible hydrogel solution", J. REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, (1990), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 905 - 910, XP002038214 [DY] 1-28 * abstract * | [Y] - MANDAI S. ET AL, "Direct thrombosis of aneurysms with cellulose acetate polymer", J. NEUROSURG., (1992), vol. 77, pages 497 - 500, XP002038215 [Y] 1-28 * page 497 * * "Material Characteristics" * |