EP0900289 - ARRANGEMENT FOR SEALING A CLOSED PRODUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTEP, Tom, Edward 10810 Lesser Scaup Landing Chesterfield, VA 23838 / US | 02 /
HOFFMAN, Ronald, P. 160 Heather Lane Glen Mills, PA 19342 / US | 03 /
HUNTER, James, R. 6 Concord Way Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 04 /
MULLER, Jean, Joseph 68, rue de Mersch L-8181 Kopstal / LU | 05 /
SCHILZ, Germain 5, Am Weier L-3914 Mondercange / LU | 06 /
VORHEES, Carl, E. 13 Firechase Circle Newark, DE 19711 / US | 07 /
WIGGINS, James, M. 1401 Lauren Court Midlothian, VA 23113 / US | 08 /
WOLL, Jean-François 29, rue Pasteur L-3273 Bettembourg / LU | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97921427.7 | 29.04.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997US07108 | Priority number, date | US19960017073P | 30.04.1996 Original published format: US 17073 P | US19960027270P | 27.09.1996 Original published format: US 27270 P | US19970847941 | 21.04.1997 Original published format: US 847941 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741282 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900289 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900289 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/11 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
D01D5/11 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49721 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4973 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/10] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES GESCHLOSSENEN PRODUKTIONSSYTEM | [2000/37] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR SEALING A CLOSED PRODUCTION SYSTEM | [1999/10] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ETANCHEITE D'UN SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION FERME | [1999/10] |
Former [1999/10] | ANORDNUNG ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES GESCHLOSSENES PRODUKTIONSSYTEM | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS62210037 ; | [A]JPS52155216 ; | [A]FR683489 (OSCAR KOHORN & CIE SOC); | [DA]US3851023 (BRETHAUER D, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880304), vol. 012, no. 070, Database accession no. (C - 479), & JP62210037 A 19870916 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780328), vol. 002, no. 046, Database accession no. (C - 009), & JP52155216 A 19771223 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |