EP0891680 - ASSIGNING CHANNELS OF DIFFERENT CAPACITIES IN A HYBRID ISDN-DECT TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLAKE, Horst Hubertusstrasse 6 D-82041 Oberhaching / DE | 02 /
KORDSMEYER, Martin Münsterstrasse 135 D-48477 Hörstel / DE | [1999/03] | Application number, filing date | 97921601.7 | 03.04.1997 | [1999/03] | WO1997DE00688 | Priority number, date | DE1996113637 | 04.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19613637 | DE1996125142 | 24.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19625142 | [1999/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9738545 | Date: | 16.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0891680 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891680 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/24 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0457 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/098 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/298 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/52 (EP,US);
H04W74/02 (EP,US);
H04W84/14 (EP,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,US);
Y10S370/904 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/03] | Title | German: | ZUWEISUNG VON KANÄLEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER KAPAZITÄT IN EINEM HYBRIDEN ISDN-DECT TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [1999/03] | English: | ASSIGNING CHANNELS OF DIFFERENT CAPACITIES IN A HYBRID ISDN-DECT TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [1999/03] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE CANAUX DE DIFFERENTES CAPACITES DANS UN SYSTEME HYBRIDE DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS RNIS-DECT | [1999/03] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.12.2002 | SE | 04.03.2003 | AT | 03.04.2003 | BE | 30.04.2003 | CH | 30.04.2003 | LI | 30.04.2003 | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/28] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 30.04.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
CH | 30.04.2003 | ||
LI | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9321719 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 2, line 35 - page 7, line 5; figure - *; | [DA] - PILGER U, "STRUKTUR DES DECT-STANDARDS", NACHRICHTENTECHNIK ELEKTRONIK, (19920101), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 23 - 29, XP000279214 [DA] 1 * paragraph [3.2.3] * |