Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3278169B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2002 | B2 | JP2000511713 | 05.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2762497 | Global Dossier | 29.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0891680 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2002 | B1 | EP0891680 | 20.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE229255T | 15.12.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9708523 | 03.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59708891D1 | 16.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1018729 | 30.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL183403B | 28.06.2002 | B1 | PL329127 | 15.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6175738 | 16.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE9700688 | 03.04.1997 | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA972793 | 31.10.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9738545 | Global Dossier | 16.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR006525 | 08.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2250862 | 16.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1196365C | 06.04.2005 | C | CN1215537 | 28.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19625142 | 29.10.1998 | C2 | DE19625142 | 09.10.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2190531T | 01.08.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID16547A | 09.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19625142 | 24.06.1996 | DE19613637 | 04.04.1996 |