EP0912381 - METHOD OF IMPROVING ABS CONTROL BEHAVIOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/27] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATISTIC, Ivica Arnsburger Strasse 20 D-60385 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Blum, Klaus-Dieter Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG, Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/18] | Application number, filing date | 97921769.2 | 25.04.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997EP02136 | Priority number, date | DE1996128981 | 18.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628981 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803384 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912381 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0912381 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/32 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T2201/16 (EP,US);
Y10S303/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES REGELVERHALTENS EINES ABS | [1999/18] | English: | METHOD OF IMPROVING ABS CONTROL BEHAVIOUR | [1999/18] | French: | PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LE COMPORTEMENT EN REGULATION D'UN SYSTEME ANTIBLOCAGE | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 24.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4112284 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1; | [A]EP0462635 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1; | [A]EP0522615 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1; | [A]EP0552456 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]DE3413738 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]DE2119590 (TELDIX GMBH) [A] 1 |