EP0897496 - PROCESS TO EVALUATE CORNERING FOR AN AUTOMATIC GEARBOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNEKEN, Markus Betznauer Strasse 12 D-88079 Kressbronn / DE | 02 /
SCHMID, Wolfgang Bleichweg 30 D-88085 Langenargen / DE | 03 /
POLJANSEK, Marko Feldbergstrasse 20 D-72768 Reutlingen / DE | 04 /
O'CONNOR, Gary 18 Cranham Close, Headless Cross Reddich B97 5AY / GB | [1999/15] |
Former [1999/08] | 01 /
HENNEKEN, Markus Betznauer Strasse 12 D-88079 Kressbronn / DE | ||
02 /
SCHMID, Wolfgang Bleichweg 30 D-88085 Langenargen / DE | |||
03 /
POLJANSEK, Marko Heimbühlstrasse 27 D-72768 Reutlingen / DE | |||
04 /
O'CONNOR, Gary 18 Cranham Close, Headless Cross Reddich B97 5AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97921856.7 | 07.05.1997 | [1999/08] | WO1997EP02318 | Priority number, date | DE1996118805 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19618805 | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743568 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897496 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897496 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H2059/003 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0227 (EP,US);
F16H59/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG EINER KURVENFAHRT BEI EINEM AUTOMATGETRIEBE | [1999/08] | English: | PROCESS TO EVALUATE CORNERING FOR AN AUTOMATIC GEARBOX | [1999/08] | French: | PROCEDE D'EVALUATION DE LA NEGOCIATION D'UNE COURBE POUR UNE BOITE AUTOMATIQUE | [1999/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5157609 (STEHLE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4679145 (BEECK PETER OP DE [BE], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5235876 (MINOWA TOSHIMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5025684 (STEHLE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column W * |