EP0836452 - SURGICALLY ANASTOMOSABLE TRANSCUTANEOUS VASCULAR PROSTHESIS AND SET COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. BRAUN CELSA (société anonyme) 30, avenue des Temps Modernes 86360 Chasseneuil du Poitou / FR | [1998/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANIDJAR, Samy 14, Passage Foubert F-75009 Paris / FR | 02 /
CHEVILLON, Gérard 7, avenue de la Marne F-92120 Montrouge / FR | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François, et al 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [1998/17] | Application number, filing date | 97921877.3 | 24.04.1997 | [1998/17] | WO1997FR00734 | Priority number, date | FR19960005505 | 02.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9605505 | FR19970004288 | 08.04.1997 Original published format: FR 9704288 | [1998/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741804 | Date: | 13.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836452 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836452 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/954 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1107 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1135 (EP,US);
A61F2/848 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2002/065 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8486 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9534 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/17] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE, ZUR ANASTOMOSE FÄHIGE, TRANSDERMALE GEFÄSSPROTHESE SOWIE EIN MIT DIESER PROTHESE AUSGESTALTETER BAUSATZ | [1998/17] | English: | SURGICALLY ANASTOMOSABLE TRANSCUTANEOUS VASCULAR PROSTHESIS AND SET COMPRISING SAME | [1998/17] | French: | PROTHESE VASCULAIRE TRANSCUTANEE CHIRURGICALEMENT ANASTOMOSABLE ET ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT UNE TELLE PROTHESE | [1998/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4562596 (KORNBERG ELLIOT [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 26 - line 29 * * column 4, line 36 - line 40 * * figures 1,2,9 *; | [A]EP0556850 (ENDOTECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,6,9,10,12 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 7-10 *; | [AD]WO8806026 (ARPESANI ALBERTO [IT]) [AD] 1,2 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 6 - line 12 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]SU1457921 ; | [AD]WO9521592 (MINTEC INC [BS], et al) [AD] 1-4,10-15 * page 21, line 25 - line 33 * * page 22, line 4 - line 21 * * figures 6,7 *; | [PA]WO9624306 (FAYS ROBERT DE [BE], et al) [PA] 1-15 * page 5, line 1 - line 14 * * page 6, line 7 - line 19 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 32, Database accession no. 89-233554, XP002035929 & SU1457921 A 19870215 (KHARK EMERG SURGERY (KHMO=)) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | EP0646365 |