EP0965342 - PREPARATION FOR PERCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION CONTAINING 6-AMINO-5-CHLORO-1-ISOPROPYL-2-(4-METHYL-1-PIPERAZINYL)BENZIMIDAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/51] | PREPARATION FOR PERCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION | ||
[2000/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, IT, LI | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | ||
For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | |||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | ||
For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAOKA, Takateru, Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
INOSAKA, Keigo, Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 03 /
AKEMI, Hitoshi, Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 04 /
ISHITANI, Hiroko, Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 05 /
OTSUKA, Saburo, Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 06 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoshiteru 32-2, Son-enji 5-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-01 / JP | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97922189.2 | 26.05.1997 | [1999/51] | WO1997JP01781 | Priority number, date | JP19960134914 | 29.05.1996 Original published format: JP 13491496 | [1999/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9745121 | Date: | 04.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965342 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965342 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K47/22, A61K9/70 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (EP,US);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/51] | A61K31/495, A61K47/30, A61K9/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/51] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG ZUR PERKUTANEN VERABREICHUNG ENTHALTEND 6-AMINO-5-CHLORO-1-ISOPROPYL-2-(4-METHYL-1-PIPERAZINYL)BENZIMIDAZOL | [2000/36] | English: | PREPARATION FOR PERCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION CONTAINING 6-AMINO-5-CHLORO-1-ISOPROPYL-2-(4-METHYL-1-PIPERAZINYL)BENZIMIDAZOLE | [2000/36] | French: | PREPARATION CONTENANT DU 6-AMINO-5-CHLORO-1-ISOPROPYL-2-(4-METHYL-1-PIPERAZINYL)BENZIMIDAZOLE DESTINEE A UNE ADMINISTRATION PERCUTANEE | [2000/37] |
Former [1999/51] | ZUBEREITUNG ZUR PERKUTANEN VERABREICHUNG | ||
Former [1999/51] | PREPARATION FOR PERCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION | ||
Former [1999/51] | PREPARATION DESTINEE A UNE ADMINISTRATION PERCUTANEE | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1998 | Translation filed | 20.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2001 | BE | 08.08.2001 | CH | 08.08.2001 | FI | 08.08.2001 | IT | 08.08.2001 | LI | 08.08.2001 | NL | 08.08.2001 | DK | 08.11.2001 | PT | 08.11.2001 | SE | 08.11.2001 | GR | 09.11.2001 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
BE | 08.08.2001 | ||
FI | 08.08.2001 | ||
NL | 08.08.2001 | ||
DK | 08.11.2001 | ||
PT | 08.11.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
GR | 09.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
BE | 08.08.2001 | ||
FI | 08.08.2001 | ||
NL | 08.08.2001 | ||
DK | 08.11.2001 | ||
PT | 08.11.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
BE | 08.08.2001 | ||
FI | 08.08.2001 | ||
NL | 08.08.2001 | ||
DK | 08.11.2001 | ||
PT | 08.11.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
BE | 08.08.2001 | ||
FI | 08.08.2001 | ||
NL | 08.08.2001 | ||
PT | 08.11.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
BE | 08.08.2001 | ||
FI | 08.08.2001 | ||
PT | 08.11.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
FI | 08.08.2001 | ||
PT | 08.11.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/20] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
FI | 08.08.2001 | ||
SE | 08.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 08.08.2001 | |
FI | 08.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5407936 (SUZUKI KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 20 * * column 5, line 22 - line 40 * * examples 2-4 * * claims 1-3 *; | [A] - HORI, M., ET AL., "Design and Synthesis of a Series of Novel Serotonin-3 Antagonists", CHEMICAL PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (1993), vol. 41, no. 10, pages 1832 - 1841, XP002125137 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS55131075 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO); | [A]JPH0748258 (KANEBO LTD) |