blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975912

EP0975912 - METAL QUICK CONNECTOR WITH "POP OFF" INSERTION INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]"POP OFF" INSERTION INDICATOR FOR METAL QUICK CONNECTORS
[2001/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc.
1105 North Market Street Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC.
1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GROOTERS, Thomas, E.
2953 Dearborn
Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US
02 / SZABO, George
2480 Perry Lake Road
Ortonville, MI 48462 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Esser, Wolfgang
ITT Industries
Regional Patent Office
Europe
Cannonstrasse 1
71384 Weinstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Esser, Wolfgang
ITT Industries Regional Patent Office Europe Cannonstrasse 1
71384 Weinstadt / DE
Former [2000/05]Esser, Wolfgang
ITT Industries Regional Patent Office - Europe c/o ITT Cannon GmbH Cannonstrasse 1
71384 Weinstadt / DE
Application number, filing date97922403.722.04.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US06763
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9848208
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975912
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975912
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:F16L37/084
[2000/05]
CPC:
F16L37/098 (EP); F16L2201/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:SCHNELLKUPPLUNG AUS METALL MIT KUPPLUNGSANZEIGER[2001/24]
English:METAL QUICK CONNECTOR WITH "POP OFF" INSERTION INDICATOR[2001/24]
French:RACCORDS METALLIQUES A ACTION RAPIDE AVEC D'INDICATEUR D'INSERTION AMOVIBLE[2001/24]
Former [2000/05]KUPPLUNGSANZEIGER FÜR SCHNELLKUPPLUNGEN AUS METALL
Former [2000/05]"POP OFF" INSERTION INDICATOR FOR METAL QUICK CONNECTORS
Former [2000/05]INDICATEUR D'INSERTION AMOVIBLE POUR RACCORDS METALLIQUES A ACTION RAPIDE
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999National basic fee paid 
22.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
26.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.10.2001Fee for grant paid
13.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Request for further processing for:13.10.2001Request for further processing filed
13.10.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.10.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US5441313  (KALAHASTHY) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XA]US5226679  (KLINGER) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15;
 [A]US4925217  (KETCHAM) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0703398  (BUNDY CORPORATION) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0547489  (ITT INDUSTRIES , INC.) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0525414  (ITT INDUSTRIES , INC.) [A] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.