EP0900175 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATING STORM WATER RUNOFF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stormwater Treatment LLC 2035 N.E. Columbia Boulevard Portland, OR 97211 / US | [1999/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNUTSON, John, H. 3116 S.E. Timberlake Drive Hillsboro, OR 97123 / US | 02 /
LENHART, James, H. 5300 S.W. 197th Avenue Aloha, OR 97007 / US | 03 /
MYERS, Michael, O. 1740 S.E. Lexington Portland, OR 97202 / US | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97922529.9 | 28.04.1997 | [1999/10] | WO1997US07160 | Priority number, date | US19960641282 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: US 641282 | [1999/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9741068 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0900175 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900175 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/28, C02F1/42, E03F5/16, B01D29/15 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
F16K31/20 (EP,US);
B01D29/15 (EP,US);
B01D29/52 (EP,US);
B01D29/668 (EP,US);
C02F1/28 (EP,US);
C02F1/281 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/286 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/10] | C02F1/28, C02F1/42, E03F5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/10] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABFLIESSENDEM REGENWASSER | [1999/10] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TREATING STORM WATER RUNOFF | [1999/10] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX PLUVIALES D'ORAGE | [1999/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.12.2002 | CH | 04.12.2002 | FI | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | LI | 04.12.2002 | NL | 04.12.2002 | DK | 04.03.2003 | PT | 05.03.2003 | LU | 28.04.2003 | MC | 30.04.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | BE | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
LU | 28.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 05.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US556725 ; | [A]US1371110 (PELPHREY LANDRUM H); | [Y]US2609932 (FRICKE GUY C); | [A]US4427542 (GLOVER RICHARD E [US]); | [X]US5330651 (ROBERTSON WILLIAM [CA], et al); | [Y]US5391295 (WILCOX JACK M [US], et al) |