Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9741121 | Global Dossier | 06.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9707416 | 02.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001518068 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9707416 | 02.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2823797 | Global Dossier | 19.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9707416 | 02.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0894089 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2003 | B9 | EP0894089 | 23.10.2002 | B1 | EP0894089 | 03.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9707416 | 02.05.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69716592T | 26.06.2003 | T2 | DE69716592D1 | 28.11.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9707416 | 02.05.1997 |