EP0897344 - SEAT, ESPECIALLY VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfau, Karl-Heinz Am Lehenwald 12 72275 Alpirsbach / DE | For all designated states Franke, Edgar Grabenstrasse 14 98716 Lohr / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states Pfau, Karl-Heinz Am Höhneck 10 72275 Alpirsbach / DE | ||
For all designated states Franke, Edgar Grabenstrasse 14 98716 Lohr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Harry, et al Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Reinhardt, Harry, et al Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97922970.5 | 06.05.1997 | [1999/08] | WO1997EP02293 | Priority number, date | DE19962008362U | 09.05.1996 Original published format: DE 29608362 U | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743143 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897344 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897344 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
A47C7/26 (EP,US);
A47C7/20 (EP,US);
B60N2/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/08] | Title | German: | SITZ, INSBESONDERE FAHRZEUGSITZ | [1999/08] | English: | SEAT, ESPECIALLY VEHICLE SEAT | [1999/08] | French: | SIEGE, NOTAMMENT SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [1999/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE INNOTEC Forschungs-und Entwicklungs-GmbH Scherdelstr. 2 95615 Marktredwitz / DE Opponent's representative Voigt, Günter Patentanwälte Dr. Schulze & Voigt Nordring 152 90119 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE INNOTEC Forschungs-und Entwicklungs-GmbH Scherdelstr. 2 95615 Marktredwitz / DE Opponent's representative Voigt, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dr. Schulze & Voigt Nordring 152 90119 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.11.2000
INNOTEC Forschungs-und Entwicklungs-GmbH Scherdelstr. 2 95615 Marktredwitz / DE Opponent's representative Voigt, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dr. Schulze & Voigt, Postfach 21 01 04 90119 Nürnberg / DE | 13.02.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.09.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.09.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.02.2000 | [2003/09] | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4938529 (FOURREY FRANCOIS [FR]); | [A]US5213392 (BOSTROM JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 59; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2691114 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 35; figures 1-4 * |