blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979472

EP0979472 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING AUTOMATED FINANCIAL TRANSACTIONS INVOLVING FOREIGN CURRENCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
388 Greenwich Street New York
New York 10013 / US
[2007/06]
Former [2007/04]For all designated states
Citicorp Banking Corporation
One Penns Way
New Castle DE 19720 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Crossmar, INC.
111 Wall Street
New York, NY 10043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / POTTER, Neil, D.
138 Vernon Terrace
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
02 / CHOMUT, Bohdan
38 Constantine Place
Summit, NJ 07091 / US
03 / JACOBS, David, M.
8 Beatrice Lane
Wayne, NJ 07470 / US
04 / RAYNER, Peter, E.
433 Roanoke Road
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
05 / ANASSON, Cynthia, M.
6 Audubon Close
Milford, CT 06460 / US
06 / FRIEDMAN, Elizabeth, J.
One Treworval Cottage, Mawnan Smith
Falmouth, Cornwall TR11 5JW / GB
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al
Hynell Intellectual Property AB
Hammarbybacken 27
120 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE
Former [2002/51]Johansson, Lars E., et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Former [2002/30]Hynell, Magnus
Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Application number, filing date97923535.515.05.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997US07478
Priority number, dateUS19960017717P15.05.1996         Original published format: US 17717 P
US1996072778608.10.1996         Original published format: US 727786
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9743727
Date:20.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979472
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2002
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/60
[2000/07]
CPC:
G06Q40/02 (EP,US); G06Q20/10 (EP,US); G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
Extension statesAL12.10.1998
LT12.10.1998
LV12.10.1998
RO12.10.1998
SI12.10.1998
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG AUTOMATISIERTER FINANZIELLER TRANSAKTIONENMIT FREMDWÄHRUNGEN[2000/07]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING AUTOMATED FINANCIAL TRANSACTIONS INVOLVING FOREIGN CURRENCIES[2000/07]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'EXECUTER DES TRANSACTIONS FINANCIERES AUTOMATIQUES EN DEVISES ETRANGERES[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase12.10.1998National basic fee paid 
12.10.1998Search fee paid 
12.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.10.1998Examination requested  [2000/07]
06.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/21]
03.09.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.01.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/21]
Appeal following examination23.10.2004Appeal received No.  T0074/05
22.12.2004Statement of grounds filed
23.01.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
23.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
26.01.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
23.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5258908  (HARTHEIMER RICHARD [US], et al);
 [Y]US5262942  (EARLE DENNIS M [US]);
 [Y]US5305200  (HARTHEIMER RICHARD [US], et al);
 [Y]US5195031  (ORDISH CHRISTOPHER J [GB]);
 [YP]US5508913  (YAMAMOTO KENICHI [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.