EP0990148 - ELECTROKINETIC PUMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orchid Cellmark Inc. 4390 U.S. Route One Princeton NJ 08540 / US | [2007/24] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Orchid BioSciences, Inc. 303 College Road East Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANZUCCHI, Peter, John 13 Jill Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 02 /
BURTON, Charlotte, Anna 555 Duquesne Boulevard Brick, NJ 08723 / US | 03 /
McBRIDE, Sterling, Edward 4214 Fieldcrest Court Lawrenceville, NJ 08638 / US | 04 /
LEVINE, Aaron, William 6 Springwood Drive Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 05 /
CHIANG, William 4106 Twin Oaks Court Monmouth Junction, NJ 08522 / US | 06 /
CHERUKURI, Satyam, Choudary 90 Cranbury Neck Road Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/14] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97923614.8 | 12.05.1997 | [2000/14] | WO1997US07880 | Priority number, date | US19960645966 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: US 645966 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743629 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990148 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, B01L3/00, B01J19/00, F04B17/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
C07C17/263 (EP,US);
B01F33/3032 (EP,US);
B01F35/7182 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
B01J4/02 (EP,US);
B01L3/5025 (EP,US);
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
C07C45/46 (EP,US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
C07C45/69 (EP,US);
C07C45/72 (EP,US);
F04B17/00 (EP,US);
F04B19/006 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
H02N11/006 (EP,US);
B01F25/41 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00315 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00317 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00351 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00353 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00358 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00369 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00389 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00488 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00495 (EP,US);
B01J2219/005 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00536 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00547 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0059 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0061 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00635 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00648 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0068 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00686 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00698 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0072 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00725 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00783 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00835 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00853 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00873 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00891 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00952 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00961 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00995 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0874 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0415 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0688 (EP,US);
B01L2400/084 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/14] | G01N27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTROKINETISCHES PUMPEN | [2000/14] | English: | ELECTROKINETIC PUMPING | [2000/14] | French: | POMPAGE ELECTROCINETIQUE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.12.1998 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 11.10.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/10] | 20.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2006 | 31.05.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9604547 (LOCKHEED MARTIN ENERGY SYS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 27 * | International search | [YP]US5534328 (ASHMEAD JAMES W [US], et al); | [Y]US5480614 (KAMAHORI MASAO [JP]); | [Y]US5384261 (WINKLER JAMES L [US], et al); | [Y]US5580523 (BARD ALLEN J [US]) | [Y] - ORG. REACT. (N.Y.), 1992, 42, HUGHES D., CAPLUS Abstract, "The Mitsunobu Reaction", p. 335-656. | [Y] - REV. HETEROAT. CHEM., 1996, 15, LUH, TIEN-YAU, CAPLUS Abstract, "Transition Metal-Catalyzed Cross-Coupling Reactions of Unactivated Aliphatic C-X Bonds", p. 61-82. | [Y] - TETRAHEDRON LETT., 1994, 35(15), CIATTINI et al., CAPLUS Abstract, "An Efficient Synthesis of 3-Substituted Indoles by Palladium-Catalyzed Coupling Reaction of 3-Tributylstannylindoles with Organic Triflates and Halides", p. 2405-8. | [Y] - USP. KHIM., 1982, 51(4), AGABAYAN et al., CAPLUS Abstract, "Amino Acids as the Amine Component in a Mannich Reaction", p. 678-95. | [Y] - PURE APPL. CHEM., (1994), 66(7), OVERMAN L., CAPLUS Abstract, "Application of Intramolecular Heck Reactions for Forming Congested Quaternary Carbon Centers in Complex Molecule Total Synthesis", p. 1423-30. | [Y] - SCOPE AND LIMITATIONS. SYNTH. COMMUN., (1986), 16(9), MORENO-MANAS et al., "The One-Pot Palladium Catalyzed Wittig Reaction with Allylic Alcohols", p. 1003-13. |