EP0901401 - AID FOR CLIMBING TREES, POLES AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kilcioglu, Mehmet Ali Maierstrasse 12 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/22] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Kilcioglu, Mehmet Ali Schreiberstrasse 33 70199 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEIDINGER, Heiko Wielandstrasse 18 D-73037 Göppingen / DE | [1999/11] | Application number, filing date | 97923809.4 | 08.05.1997 | [1999/11] | WO1997DE00962 | Priority number, date | DE1996208382U | 09.05.1996 Original published format: DE 29608382 U | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9743016 | Date: | 20.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0901401 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901401 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63B27/00 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
H02G1/02 (EP);
A63B27/00 (EP);
H02G7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/11] | Title | German: | HILFSMITTEL ZUM BESTEIGEN VON BÄUMEN, MASTEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [1999/11] | English: | AID FOR CLIMBING TREES, POLES AND THE LIKE | [1999/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUXILIAIRE POUR GRIMPER AUX MATS, ARBRES ET SIMILAIRES | [1999/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Request for further processing for: | 21.02.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 09.10.2002 | NL | 09.10.2002 | DK | 09.01.2003 | LU | 08.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/02] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
LU | 08.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
LU | 08.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
NL | 09.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 09.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR699522 (RAVASSE) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]CA1266760 (ANDRUCHIW ROMAN) [X] 1-4,7 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 5 * * page 8, line 18 - line 26; figure 1 * [Y] 6,8; | [YD]WO9314824 (BELL MICHAEL [US]) [YD] 6 * abstract *; | [Y]US5341896 (AMACKER JOSEPH A [US]) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 24 - line 37; figure - * |