EP0904268 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 3-(1-HYDROXYPHENYL-1-ALKOXIMINOMETHYL)DIOXAZINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAYER, Herbert Sandstrasse 66 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
GALLENKAMP, Bernd Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 13 D-42113 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
GERDES, Peter Waldstrasse 75 D-52080 Aachen / DE | 04 /
HEINEMANN, Ulrich Am Sonnenhang 1 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | 05 /
KRÜGER, Bernd-Wieland Am Vorend 52 D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 06 /
LANTZSCH, Reinhard Am Buschhäuschen 51 D-42115 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
SEITZ, Thomas Rietherbach 10b D-40764 Langenfeld / DE | 08 /
STELZER, Uwe Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 22a D-51399 Burscheid / DE | [1999/13] | Application number, filing date | 97923924.1 | 16.05.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997EP02526 | Priority number, date | DE1996121696 | 30.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19621696 | DE1996151034 | 09.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19651034 | DE1997106399 | 19.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706399 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746542 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904268 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904268 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D273/00, C07D307/82, C07D307/83 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C07D273/00 (EP,US);
C07D307/82 (EP,US);
C07D307/83 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 3-(1-HYDROXYPHENYL-1-ALKOXIMINOMETHYL)DIOXAZINEN | [1999/13] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 3-(1-HYDROXYPHENYL-1-ALKOXIMINOMETHYL)DIOXAZINES | [1999/13] | French: | PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE 3-(1-HYDROXYPHENYL-1-ALCOXIMINOMETHYLE)DIOXAZINES | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01122525.7 / EP1188753 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4408005 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 76 - page 79 *; | [D]WO9504728 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [AD] - K. V. RAO ET AL., "Reactivity of 2-Hydroxy-omega-nitroacetophenones: synthesis of 2-oximinocoumaranones", PROC. INDIAN ACAD. SCI., SECT. A, (1976), vol. 83A, no. 6, pages 238 - 42, XP002039743 [AD] 6,8 * siehe Seite 240, Schema 2 * | [A] - K. V. RAO ET AL., "Synthesis of 2-Methyl-3-nitrochromones", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1977), vol. 15B, no. 3, pages 236 - 7, XP002039744 [A] 6,8 * siehe Seite 236, Schema 1, Verbindung II * | [A] - O. P. JHA, "Synthesis of Abutic Acid (5,6-Dimethoxycoumarone-2,3-dicarboxylic Acid)", INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1973), vol. 11, no. 10, pages 989 - 90, XP002039745 [A] 6,8 * siehe Seite 989, Verbindung V * | [A] - W. V. CURRAN ET AL., "A novel conversion of chromone-3-carboxaldehyde to 5-nitro-2,3-benzofurandione-(Z)-2-oxime", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1979), no. 24, pages 2221 - 4, XP002039746 [A] 6,8 * siehe Seite 2221, Verbindung 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)93681-0 | [A] - S. SMATI ET AL., "Synthèse et activités anti-inflammatoire et analgésique d'acides (2H-benzofurannone-3)-2 iminoxy alcanoiques", EUR. J. MED. CHEM. - CHIM. THER., (1984), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 551 - 4, XP002039747 [A] 6,8 * table I * | [A] - H. LOTH ET AL., "Eine neue Synthese von 2-Acyloxyimino-cumaranonen", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, (1973), vol. 306, no. 2, pages 122 - 6, XP002039748 [A] 6,8 |