EP0904324 - METHOD OF COATING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [1999/44] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖFER, Rainer Klever Strasse 31 D-40477 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHULTE, Heinz-Günther Winster Strasse 66 D-45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
FROMMELIUS, Harald Seefelder Weg 2 D-40789 Monheim / DE | [1999/13] | Application number, filing date | 97923979.5 | 22.05.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997EP02621 | Priority number, date | DE1996122221 | 03.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19622221 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746628 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904324 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904324 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/44 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C08G65/332 (EP,US);
C09D171/02 (EP,US);
C09D5/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER SUBSTRATE | [1999/13] | English: | METHOD OF COATING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATES | [1999/13] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RECOUVRIR DES SUBSTRATS ELECTROCONDUCTEURS | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0109760 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 5 - page 8, line 20; claims 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0339795 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [DA] 1* page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 55; claims 1,4-8 *; | [A]EP0640699 (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 42 - page 3, line 14; claim 1; table 1 * |