EP0906397 - USE OF COPOLYMERS TO INCREASE THE DISSOLUTION RATE OF PARTICULATE DETERGENT FORMULATIONS IN WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUFF, Jürgen Luitpoldstrasse 3 D-67281 Bissersheim / DE | 02 /
JÄGER, Hans-Ulrich Erschigweg 31 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
AUS DEM KAHMEN, Martin Saarburger Strasse 29 D-67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
KRONER, Matthias Brucknerstrasse 25 D-67304 Eisenberg / DE | 05 /
LUX, Jürgen, Alfred Rohrweiherweg 10 D-67150 Niederkirchen / DE | 06 /
OETTER, Günter Hans-von-Marees-Strasse 21 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | [1999/14] | Application number, filing date | 97924025.6 | 28.05.1997 | [1999/14] | WO1997EP02764 | Priority number, date | DE1996121983 | 03.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19621983 | [1999/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9746657 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0906397 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
C11D3/3761 (EP);
C08F210/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/14] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON COPOLYMEREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER LÖSEGESCHWINDIGKEIT VON TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN WASCHMITTELFORMULIERUNGEN IN WASSER | [1999/14] | English: | USE OF COPOLYMERS TO INCREASE THE DISSOLUTION RATE OF PARTICULATE DETERGENT FORMULATIONS IN WATER | [1999/14] | French: | UTILISATION DE COPOLYMERES POUR AUGMENTER LA VITESSE DE DISSOLUTION DE FORMULATIONS DETERGENTES PARTICULAIRES DANS L'EAU | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0892591 ; | [A]EP0080222 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1,5-12 * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 35; examples 1,6; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4867972 (GIRARDEAU YVETTE ET AL) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 5 - line 52; example -; claim - *; | [A]JPS61231099 ; | [A]JPH02155928 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 24, Database accession no. 96-236357, XP002046873 & JPH0892591 A 19960409 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 48, Database accession no. 86-314279, XP002046874 & JPS61231099 A 19861015 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 30, Database accession no. 90-227943, XP002046875 & JPH02155928 A 19900615 (KAO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |