EP0923809 - SATELLITE RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMESEN, M., T. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
RUITENBURG, Leo, J., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Peters, Carl Heinrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Peters, Carl Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97924218.7 | 18.06.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997IB00736 | Priority number, date | EP19960110361 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: EP 96110361 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9750187 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923809 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/26 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
H03L7/0805 (EP,US);
H04B1/26 (KR);
H03D7/165 (EP,US);
H03J7/285 (EP,US);
H03L7/107 (EP,US);
H04B7/18517 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/25] | Title | German: | SATELLITENSIGNAL EMPFÄNGER | [1999/25] | English: | SATELLITE RECEIVER | [1999/25] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE SIGNAUX DE SATELLITE | [1999/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 10.10.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4117420 (DECONINCK WILFRIED RENE GORET); | [A]US5452327 (BARHAM STEVEN T [US], et al); | [A]WO8806383 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]US5507025 (RODEFFER CHARLES E [US]) |