EP0847620 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A FEEDBACK LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | |||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPARKS, Geoffrey, Sidney Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Peters, Carl Heinrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Peters, Carl Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97924219.5 | 18.06.1997 | [1998/25] | WO1997IB00737 | Priority number, date | EP19960110468 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: EP 96110468 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9800910 | Date: | 08.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847620 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847620 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/34 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
H03G3/3042 (EP,US);
H03F1/34 (EP,US);
H03F2200/207 (EP,US);
H03F2200/336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/25] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT RÜCKKOPPLUNGSSCHLEIFE | [1998/25] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A FEEDBACK LOOP | [1998/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CIRCUIT COMPRENANT UNE BOUCLE DE RETROACTION | [1998/25] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9508866 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) |