Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0882769
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.10.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
19.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
12.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.01.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.02.2000 |
First examination report |
|
04.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.04.1999 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] |
01.04.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] |
23.10.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
23.10.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
19.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|