EP0882769 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SURFACE-TREATED CARBON BLACK FOR THE REINFORCEMENT OF RUBBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAZURA, Tetsuji The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Kazunori The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd. Hiratsuka Factory 2-1, Oiwake Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254 / JP | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97924318.5 | 04.06.1997 | [1998/50] | WO1997JP01901 | Priority number, date | JP19960212768 | 12.08.1996 Original published format: JP 21276896 | [1998/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9806787 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882769 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882769 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/56, C08K9/06, C08L21/00, C08K9/08 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
C09C1/56 (EP,KR,US);
C08K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (KR);
C01P2004/84 (US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K9/06, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/08, C08L21/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1998/50] | C09C1/56, C08K9/06, C08L21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1998/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTEM RUSS ZUR KAUTSCHUKVERSTÄRKUNG | [1998/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SURFACE-TREATED CARBON BLACK FOR THE REINFORCEMENT OF RUBBERS | [1998/50] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN NOIR DE CARBONE A SURFACE TRAITEE, DESTINE A RENFORCER LES CAOUTCHOUCS | [1998/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1998 | Translation filed | 09.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 08.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0353260 ; | [D]JPS53100190 (HOKURIKU ELECT IND); | [D]JPS61291659 (KYOWA YUKA KK); | [A]EP0468140 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [D]JPH04233976 (DEGUSSA); | [E]EP0896987 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,4,5 * claims 1-11 * * page 3, line 46 - page 5, line 51 *; | [X] - FUJITA KIYOSHI ET AL., "Improving the properties of carbon black", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19870921), vol. 107, no. 12, Database accession no. 99209, XP002097512 [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - ENDO TSUNEHIKO, "Carbon black with high resistivity", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790219), vol. 90, no. 8, Database accession no. 57293, XP002097513 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 16, Database accession no. 91-112884, XP002097797 & JPH0353260 A 19910307 (CANON KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH01126375 (MITSUBISHI KASEI VINYL); | [A]JPH01182368 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]JPH04190839 (KANEBO LTD); | [P]JPH09118780 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [P]JPH09118781 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) |