EP0973063 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - refusal | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photo Craft Co., Ltd 11-37, Yuhigaoka 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states Photo Craft Co., Ltd 11-37, Yuhigaoka 2-chome Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAMIKAWA, Yukio, Photo Craft Co., Ltd. 14-28, Miyahara 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532 / JP | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97924339.1 | 06.06.1997 | [2000/03] | WO1997JP01934 | Priority number, date | JP19960146181 | 07.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14618196 | [2000/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9746911 | Date: | 11.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973063 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03B35/00, G03B35/24 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
G03B35/24 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (EP,US);
G03B35/14 (EP,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/361 (EP,US);
H04N13/122 (EP,US);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN BILDES | [2000/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE | [2000/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE IMAGE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1998 | Translation filed | 07.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 07.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.12.1998 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/46] | 11.05.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/46] | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/32] | 14.06.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.05.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/32] | Appeal following examination | 24.10.2005 | Appeal received No. T1401/05 | 24.10.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.05.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 11.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 24.10.2005 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0520179 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] * column 20, line 24 - column 21, line 10 *; | [X]EP0590498 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 30 - line 43 * * column 3, line 36 - line 57 * * column 4, line 28 - line 36 * * column 8, lines 13-16 * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH06282019 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [Y]JPH089422 (SONY CORP) |