EP0917517 - CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For:DK
FI
SE
Petrolia AB P.O.Box 5194 102 44 Stockholm / SE | For all designated states NILSSON, Hugo Gnustorp Tutaryd S-341 96 Ljungby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For:DK
FI
SE
Petrolia AB P.O.Box 5194 102 44 Stockholm / SE | ||
For all designated states NILSSON, Hugo Gnustorp Tutaryd S-341 96 Ljungby / SE | |||
Former [1999/21] | For:DK
FI
SE
Peyrolia AB P.O.Box 5194 102 44 Stockholm / SE | ||
For all designated states NILSSON, Hugo Gnustorp Tutaryd S-341 96 Ljungby / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnsson, Karl-Eric Aby 340 14 Lagan / SE | 02 /
Nilsson, Hugo Gnustorp, Tutaryd 341 96 Ljungby / SE | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Siebmanns, Hubertus Gotapatent AB, Box 154 561 22 Huskvarna / SE | [1999/21] | Application number, filing date | 97924441.5 | 21.05.1997 | [1999/21] | WO1997SE00831 | Priority number, date | SE19960001954 | 21.05.1996 Original published format: SE 9601954 | [1999/21] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9744250 | Date: | 27.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917517 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917517 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/20, B65D25/40 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
B65D25/56 (EP,US);
B65D25/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/21] | Extension states | LT | 02.12.1998 | LV | 02.12.1998 | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER | [1999/21] | English: | CONTAINER | [1999/21] | French: | BIDON | [1999/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1997 | Translation filed | 02.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2003 | BE | 21.05.2003 | CH | 21.05.2003 | FR | 21.05.2003 | IE | 21.05.2003 | IT | 21.05.2003 | LI | 21.05.2003 | LU | 21.05.2003 | NL | 21.05.2003 | MC | 31.05.2003 | GB | 21.08.2003 | GR | 21.08.2003 | PT | 21.08.2003 | SE | 21.08.2003 | DE | 22.08.2003 | ES | 01.09.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FR | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LU | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
MC | 31.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FR | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LU | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GB | 21.08.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FR | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
LU | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/34] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
FR | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
IE | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 21.05.2003 | ||
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
DE | 22.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 21.05.2003 | |
CH | 21.05.2003 | ||
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
ES | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
NL | 21.05.2003 | ||
GR | 21.08.2003 | ||
PT | 21.08.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 21.05.2003 | |
LI | 21.05.2003 | ||
SE | 21.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 21.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1544503 (WAYNE THOMSON VOLNEY); | [A]GB2225765 (JUANG MING JEN); | [A]DE19513650 (LAGAN PLAST AB [SE]) |