blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0840774

EP0840774 - FUEL ADDITIVE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYALKYPHENOXYAMINOALKANES AND POLY(OXYALKYLENE) AMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.06.2004  [2004/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chevron Oronite Company LLC
Third floor, 2613 Camino Ramon
San Ramon, CA 94583-4289 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
Chevron Oronite Company LLC
Third floor, 2613 Camino Ramon
San Ramon, CA 94583-4289 / US
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Chevron Chemical Company LLC
2613 Camino Ramon
San Ramon, CA 94583-4289 / US
Former [1998/36]For all designated states
Chevron Chemical Company LLC
575 Market Street
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
Former [1998/20]For all designated states
CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY
555 Market Street, Post Office Box 7141
San Francisco, California 94120-7141 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHERPECK, Richard, E.
8962 Cypress Avenue
Cotati, CA 94931 / US
02 / MORRIS, Jack, E.
54 Wildwood Place
El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US
03 / AHMADI, Majid, R.
321 Del Monte Way
Pinole, CA 94564 / US
[1998/20]
Representative(s)Nash, David Allan
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/20]Nash, David Allan
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date97924651.912.05.1997
[1998/20]
WO1997US07915
Priority number, dateUS1996064599214.05.1996         Original published format: US 645992
US1997084671730.04.1997         Original published format: US 846717
[1998/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9743359
Date:20.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0840774
Date:13.05.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0840774
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C10L1/22, C07C217/64, C08F8/32, C10L1/14, C10L10/00
[2000/06]
CPC:
C10L1/238 (EP); C08F8/30 (EP); C10L10/04 (EP);
C10L1/143 (EP); C10L1/1608 (EP); C10L1/1616 (EP);
C10L1/1641 (EP); C10L1/1824 (EP); C10L1/1852 (EP);
C10L1/19 (EP); C10L1/1985 (EP); C10L1/2383 (EP);
C10L1/2387 (EP); C10L1/305 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C08F8/30, C08F10/00 (EP)
Former IPC [1998/20]C10L1/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1998/20]
TitleGerman:POLYALKYPHENOXYAMINOALKANE UND POLY(OXYALKYLENEN)AMINE ENTHALTENDE TREIBSTOFFADDITIVZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN.[1998/20]
English:FUEL ADDITIVE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYALKYPHENOXYAMINOALKANES AND POLY(OXYALKYLENE) AMINES[1998/20]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'ADDITIFS POUR CARBURANT CONTENANT DES POLYALKYLPHENOXAMINOALCANES ET DES POLY(OXYALKYLENE) AMINES[1998/20]
Entry into regional phase12.02.1998National basic fee paid 
12.02.1998Search fee paid 
12.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
12.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/20]
09.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2003Fee for grant paid
01.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US5366517  ;
 [A]US5300701  ;
 [Y]US5094667  ;
 [Y]US4964879  ;
 [Y]US4778481  ;
 [Y]US4609377  ;
 [A]US4604103  ;
 [A]US4332595  ;
 [A]US4322220  ;
 [A]US4024083  ;
 [A]US3440029
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.