EP0904314 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SULPHUR-CONTAINING POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ticona GmbH Professor-Staudinger-Strasse 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Ticona GmbH Professor-Staudinger-strasse 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Ticona GmbH An der B 43 65451 Kelsterbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUBS, Michael Auf dem Weiher 18 D-55545 Bad Kreuznach / DE | 02 /
WAGENER, Reinhard Kapellenstrasse 30 D-65439 Flörsheim / DE | [1999/13] | Application number, filing date | 97925051.1 | 06.06.1997 | [1999/13] | WO1997EP02931 | Priority number, date | DE1996123706 | 14.06.1996 Original published format: DE 19623706 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9747676 | Date: | 18.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0904314 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0904314 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/02 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
C08G75/0254 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHWEFELHALTIGEN POLYMEREN | [1999/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SULPHUR-CONTAINING POLYMERS | [1999/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYMERES CONTENANT DU SOUFRE | [1999/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Request for further processing for: | 13.01.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]EP0737705 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [PA] 1-10; | [A]EP0256757 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 |