EP0841869 - VACUUM CLEANER COMPRISING IMPROVED CONNECTION WITH A SUCTION PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERBOAS, Pierre 4, rue du Ravin,La Vallée Bance F-27120 Chambray / FR | [1998/21] | Application number, filing date | 97925102.2 | 20.05.1997 | [1998/21] | WO1997FR00879 | Priority number, date | FR19960006625 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9606625 | [1998/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9743939 | Date: | 27.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841869 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/24, A47L9/00 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
A47L9/00 (EP);
A47L9/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1998/21] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG EINES SAUGSCHLAUCHS AN EINEM STAUBSAUGER | [1998/21] | English: | VACUUM CLEANER COMPRISING IMPROVED CONNECTION WITH A SUCTION PIPE | [1998/21] | French: | ASPIRATEUR COMPORTANT UNE CONNEXION AMELIOREE AVEC UN TUYAU D'ASPIRATION | [1998/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/25] | 19.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9515109 (SEB S.A.); | [A]NL61583C (J. A. C. MALCHUS); | [A]US3375541 (C. T. FROMKNECHT); | [A]US3438081 (J. A. RUZZIER); | [A]EP0677270 (VORWERK & CO. INTERHOLDING GMBH); | [A]EP0405888 (HITACHI, LTD.) |