EP1015612 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING RECOMBINANT PROTEINS USING HIGHLY EFFICIENT EXPRESSION VECTOR FROM SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanil Synthetic Fiber Co., Ltd. 222, Yangduk-dong, Hoiwon-ku Masan-si 630-490 / KR | [2004/35] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Hanil Synthetic Fiber Co., Ltd. 222, Yangduk-dong, Hoiwon-ku Masan-si, Kyoungsangnam-do 630-490 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Ki-Ryong 113-705, Samsung Pooreun Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yusong-ku Taejon-si 305-390 / KR | 02 /
MOON, Jae-Woong 113-903, Samsung Pooreun Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yusong-ku Taejon-si 305-390 / KR | 03 /
BAE, Cheon-Soon 113-701, Samsung Pooreun Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yusong-ku Taejon-si 305-390 / KR | 04 /
YANG, Doo-Suk 113-603, Samsung Pooreun Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yusong-ku Taejon-si 305-390 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Jee-Won 111-302, Samsung Pooreun Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yusong-ku Taejon-si 305-390 / KR | 06 /
SEONG, Baik-Lin 111-301, Samsung Pooreun Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yusong-ku Taejon-si 305-390 / KR | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Hall, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97925313.5 | 27.05.1997 | [2000/27] | WO1997KR00097 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854339 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1015612 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1015612 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/79, C12N1/19, C12N15/27, C12N15/18, // (C12N1/19, C12R1:865) | [2000/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/39 (EP,US);
C07K14/53 (EP,US);
C07K14/545 (EP,US);
C07K14/61 (EP,US);
C12N15/81 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REKOMBINANTEN EIWEISSEN DURCH VERWENDUNG VON HOCHEFFIZIENTEN EXPRESSIONSVEKTOREN AUS SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE | [2000/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING RECOMBINANT PROTEINS USING HIGHLY EFFICIENT EXPRESSION VECTOR FROM SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE | [2000/27] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE MISE AU POINT DE PROTEINES DE RECOMBINAISON FAISANT INTERVENIR UN VECTEUR D'EXPRESSION DES PLUS EFFICACE ISSU DE SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE | [2000/27] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 19.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.01.2005 | FR | 26.01.2005 | IT | 26.01.2005 | LI | 26.01.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | DE | 27.04.2005 | ES | 07.05.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/32] | CH | 26.01.2005 | |
FR | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/18] | CH | 26.01.2005 | |
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
DE | 27.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | CH | 26.01.2005 | |
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
ES | 07.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9100920 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [A]EP0243153 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0132309 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) |