blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0901604

EP0901604 - SAFETY MECHANISM FOR RIFLES WITH A CYLINDRICAL BREECH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.01.2001 [2001/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Franz-Josefs-Kai 51
1010 Wien / AT
[1999/11]
Inventor(s)01 / KEFER, Hubert
Hubhanslauweg 21
A-4820 Bad Ischl / AT
[1999/11]
Application number, filing date97925760.706.06.1997
[1999/11]
WO1997AT00116
Priority number, dateAT1996000098707.06.1996         Original published format: AT 98796
[1999/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9747940
Date:18.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/54]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0901604
Date:17.03.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0901604
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.1997
ClassificationIPC:F41A17/56
[1999/11]
CPC:
F41A17/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/11]
TitleGerman:SICHERUNG FÜR GEWEHRE MIT ZYLINDERVERSCHLUSS[1999/11]
English:SAFETY MECHANISM FOR RIFLES WITH A CYLINDRICAL BREECH[1999/11]
French:MECANISME DE SURETE POUR ARMES A FEU A CULASSE CYLINDRIQUE[1999/11]
Entry into regional phase13.11.1998National basic fee paid 
13.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/11]
12.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.1999Fee for grant paid
06.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]AT238595B  (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG);
 [A]DE3704853  (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]AT388610B  (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG [AT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.