EP0914180 - IRRADIATING APPARATUS USING A SCANNING LIGHT SOURCE FOR PHOTODYNAMIC TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celmed Biosciences Inc. 2310, Alfred-Nobel Boulevard Saint-Laurent Quebec H4S 2A4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Celmed Biosciences Inc. 2310, Alfred-Nobel Boulevard Saint-Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states THERATECHNOLOGIES INC. 2310 boulevard Alfred Nobel Saint-Laurent, Québec H4S 2A4 / CA | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states THERATECHNOLOGIES INC. 2310 boulevard Alfrad Nobel Saint-Laurent, Québec H4S 2A4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states Theratechnologies R & D Inc. 5th floor, 630 René-Lévesque Boulevard West Montréal, Québec H3B 1S6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLENEUVE, Luc 2117 St-Joseph Boulevard Montréal, Québec H2H 1E6 / CA | 02 /
MILLER, Gérard 1901 Trans-Canada Highway Dorval, Québec H9P 1J6 / CA | 03 /
BERNIER, Robert 1901 Trans-Canada Highway Dorval, Québec H9P 1J6 / CA | 04 /
LAURENDEAU, Claude 995 Le Gardeur Boucherville, Québec J4B 6S9 / CA | 05 /
PAL, Prabir, Kumar 2/143 Sree Colony, P.O. Request Estate Calcutta 700092 / IN | 06 /
BLANCHARD, Louise 6185 Chemin Hudson, app. 7 Montrèal, Quebec H3S 2G9 / CA | [1999/29] |
Former [1999/19] | 01 /
VILLENEUVE, Luc 2117 St-Joseph Boulevard Montréal, Québec H2H 1E6 / CA | ||
02 /
MILLER, Gérard 1901 Trans-Canada Highway Dorval, Québec H9P 1J6 / CA | |||
03 /
BERNIER, Robert 1901 Trans-Canada Highway Dorval, Québec H9P 1J6 / CA | |||
04 /
LAURENDEAU, Claude 995 Le Gardeur Boucherville, Québec J4B 6S9 / CA | |||
05 /
PAL, Prabir, Kumar 2/143 Sree Colony, P.O. Request Estate Calcutta 700092 / IN | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/19] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97925806.8 | 18.06.1997 | [1999/19] | WO1997CA00429 | Priority number, date | US19960685598 | 19.07.1996 Original published format: US 685598 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803224 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914180 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914180 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
A61N5/062 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0632 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0642 (EP,US);
A61N5/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/19] | Title | German: | BESTRAHLUNGSGERÄT ZUR PHOTODYNAMISCHEN BEHANDLUNG MITTELS EINER OPTISCHEN ABTASTUNG | [1999/19] | English: | IRRADIATING APPARATUS USING A SCANNING LIGHT SOURCE FOR PHOTODYNAMIC TREATMENT | [1999/19] | French: | APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION AUX RAYONNEMENTS UTILISANT UNE SOURCE DE LUMIERE BALAYANTE POUR TRAITEMENT PHOTODYNAMIQUE | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2590489 (GENIN MEDICAL SA [FR]) [A] 1,11,17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8717182U (SCHLIEFFEN) [A] 1,11,17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9118646 (OMEGA UNIVERSAL HOLDINGS [GB]) [A] 1,11,17 * abstract *; | [A]WO9321842 (QUADRA LOGIC TECH INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,11,17 * page 15, line 17 - page 17, line 3 * * abstract *; | [PA]WO9719725 (NAGYPAL TIBOR [AT], et al) [PA] 1,11,17* abstract * |